This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 06:18:36 (UTC).

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. v. Linda Thompson et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Linda Thompson. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******020E

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Defendants

Citibank, NA

New York City Parking Violations Bureau

Linda Thompson

New York City Environmental Control Board

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #10, the last ten names being fictitious and unknown to the plaintiff, the person or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Mortgaged premises described i

New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau

Tanya Elkerson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALASCO, TODD C

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DENISE MORGAN AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DENISE MORGAN AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TANYA ELKERSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TANYA ELKERSON; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LINDA THOMPSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LINDA THOMPSON; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Supporting Documents for Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Supporting Documents for Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Holder of Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Holder of Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description of property Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description of property Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DENISE MORGAN AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TANYA ELKERSON; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LINDA THOMPSON; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CITIBANK, NA; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-DENISE MORGAN AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Falasco, T. - filed by Provest; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Supporting Documents for Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Holder of Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Legal Description of property Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less