This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 20:17:42 (UTC).

SEGUNDO IDROVO v. CLAUDE T. BRADY

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 SEGUNDO IDROVO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLAUDE T BRADY. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Segundo Idrovo

Defendant

Claude T. Brady

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINELLI, CHARLES EDWARD

Attorney at Law Office of Charles E. Finelli

Defendant Attorneys

NOVITZ, RONDIENE E

Attorney at CRUSER, MITCHELL, NOVITZ, SANCHEZ, GASTON & ZIMET, LLP

BRYDSON, CARLA SHANNON

Attorney at Cruser, Mitchell, Novitz, Sanchez, Gaston & Zimet, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Brydson, C.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 08/20/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 08/20/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars & Combined Demands.

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars & Combined Demands.; Filed By: Novitz, R.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer.

ANSWER Verified Answer.; Filed By: Novitz, R.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE with certified mail receipt

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE with certified mail receipt; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Brydson, C.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 08/20/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars & Combined Demands.; Filed By: Novitz, R.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer.; Filed By: Novitz, R.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE with certified mail receipt; Filed By: Finelli, C. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finelli, C.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less