This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 07/23/2023 at 04:01:05 (UTC).

Scott Thomas v. North Country Family Health Center, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Scott Thomas filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against North Country Family Health Center, Inc. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is William Ramseier. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0689

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

William Ramseier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Thomas

Defendants

North Country Childrens Clinic

NORTH COUNTRY FAMILY HEALTH CENTER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUATTROCCI, ROBERT ALAN

Defendant Attorney

SCHOONMAKER, CORY JOHN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Schoonmaker, C.; Filed: 04/06/2023; Received: 04/06/2023

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference September 2, 2022 at 2:00 p.m.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference September 2, 2022 at 2:00 p.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2022; Received: 08/09/2022

RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)

RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2022; Received: 08/08/2022

APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY)

APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2022; Received: 08/08/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER TO APPELLATE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER TO APPELLATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED); Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) with attached Memorandum Decision and Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) with attached Memorandum Decision and Order; Filed By: Schoonmaker, C.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with attached Memorandum Decision and Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with attached Memorandum Decision and Order; Filed By: Schoonmaker, C.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1); Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/24/2021; Received: 05/24/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/24/2021; Received: 05/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Continental Construction

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Continental Construction; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/10/2021; Received: 05/10/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306 C NOTICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306 C NOTICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Van Duser, K.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Van Duser, K.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Schoonmaker, C.; Filed: 04/06/2023; Received: 04/06/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference September 2, 2022 at 2:00 p.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2022; Received: 08/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRECORD ON APPEAL (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2022; Received: 08/08/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2022; Received: 08/08/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER TO APPELLATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED); Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 10/01/2021; Received: 10/01/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/01/2021; Received: 09/01/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) with attached Memorandum Decision and Order; Filed By: Schoonmaker, C.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) with attached Memorandum Decision and Order; Filed By: Schoonmaker, C.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 08/31/2021; Received: 08/31/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation with Exhibits; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/24/2021; Received: 05/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1); Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/24/2021; Received: 05/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/24/2021; Received: 05/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Continental Construction; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/10/2021; Received: 05/10/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306 C NOTICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Van Duser, K.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2019
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Van Duser, K.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less