This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:20:04 (UTC).

SCOTT EPSTEIN v. ROBERT I. CANTOR et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 SCOTT EPSTEIN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ROBERT I CANTOR. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Epstein individually and as a Partner of Cantor, Epstein & Mazzola, LLP

Defendants

ROBERT I. CANTOR PLLC

BOYD RICHARDS NY, LLC

Robert I. Cantor

W. Todd Boyd

Bryan J. Mazzola

BOYD, RICHARDS PARKER COLONELLI,P.L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HILLER, MICHAEL S

Attorney at HILLER, PC

EPSTEIN, SCOTT W

Attorney at ANTIN, EHRLICH & EPSTEIN, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

EISENSTEIN, JETHRO M

Attorney at PROFETA & EISENSTEIN

AIELLO, JACQUELINE LISA

Attorney at Boyd Richards Parker & Colonnelli, P.L.

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #8)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #8); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #8) Affidavit of Scott Epstein

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #8) Affidavit of Scott Epstein; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #8) Boyd Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #8) Boyd Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #8) Affirmation of Jacqueline Aiello

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #8) Affirmation of Jacqueline Aiello; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #8) First Amended Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #8) First Amended Complaint; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #7)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #7); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #8); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #8) Affidavit of Scott Epstein; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #8) Boyd Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #8) Affirmation of Jacqueline Aiello; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #8) First Amended Complaint; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #7); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #7) Partnership Agreement; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Aiello, J.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Epstein, S. - filed by Fuentes, E.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI); Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Hiller, M.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less