This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:14:31 (UTC).

SCOTT D. BONGIORNO et al - v. - LATEEF J. BURTON et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 SCOTT D BONGIORNO filed an Other lawsuit against LATEEF J BURTON. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda R. Lawson

Scott D. Bongiorno

Defendants

Lateef J. Burton

Ana M. Bryson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBLATT, HELEN M.

Defendant Attorney

GRGAS, STEVEN

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A POLICE REPORT

EXHIBIT(S) - A POLICE REPORT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/2/18

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/2/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 03/17/2018; Received: 03/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR LATEEF J. BURTON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR LATEEF J. BURTON; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION REPLY AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION REPLY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 12/15/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 12/15/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ANA M. BRYSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ANA M. BRYSON; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/2/18

ORDER - OTHER dated 1/2/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 1/2/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 03/17/2018; Received: 03/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 1/2/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 12/15/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A POLICE REPORT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION REPLY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR LATEEF J. BURTON; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR ANA M. BRYSON; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosenblatt, H. - filed by Chelli & Bush; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less