This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:21:56 (UTC).

Scenic Glass Installations Corp. v. Pioneer Window Mfg. Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Scenic Glass Installations Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pioneer Window Mfg Corp. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scenic Glass Installations Corp.

Defendants

Pioneer Window Mfg. Corp.

Suretec Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHENG, MENG

Attorney at Meng Cheng, Esq.

ZISHOLTZ, STUART SHALOM

Attorney at Zisholtz & Zisholtz, LLP

MASTROGIANNIS, WILLIAM ARISTOTLE

Attorney at ZISHOLTZ & ZISHOLTZ, LLP

Defendant Attorney

SOLLER, CHRISTIAN JOSEPH

Attorney at HODGSON RUSS LLP

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaims

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaims; Filed By: Cheng, M.; Filed: 10/04/2021; Received: 10/04/2021

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaim

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaim; Filed By: Soller, C.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Zisholtz, S.; Filed: 08/27/2021; Received: 08/27/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mastrogiannis, W.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mastrogiannis, W.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaims; Filed By: Cheng, M.; Filed: 10/04/2021; Received: 10/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaim; Filed By: Soller, C.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Zisholtz, S.; Filed: 08/27/2021; Received: 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mastrogiannis, W.; Filed: 08/11/2021; Received: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mastrogiannis, W.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less