Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 03/20/2021 at 07:06:35 (UTC).

Saratoga Economic Development Corporation v. State of New York Authorities Budget Office

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Saratoga Economic Development Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against State of New York Authorities Budget Office. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Filed By:. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Filed By:

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saratoga Economic Development Corporation

Defendant

State of New York Authorities Budget Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIDL, CYNTHIA

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

Defendant Attorney

BUCKLEY, DENISE PATRICIA

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Buckley, D.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service to State of New York Authorities Budget Office

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service to State of New York Authorities Budget Office; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service to Office of New York State Attorney General

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service to Office of New York State Attorney General; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Notice of Petition and Summons

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Notice of Petition and Summons; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 30 ABO December 4, 2020 Email

EXHIBIT(S) - 30 ABO December 4, 2020 Email; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 29 SEDC November 30, 2020 Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - 29 SEDC November 30, 2020 Letter; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 28 ABO November 24, 2020 Email

EXHIBIT(S) - 28 ABO November 24, 2020 Email; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 Member Investors

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 Member Investors; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Board of Governors

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Board of Governors; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Board Members

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Board Members; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Amended By-Laws

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Amended By-Laws; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 SEDC By-Laws

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 SEDC By-Laws; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 2010 Amended Certificate of Incorporation

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 2010 Amended Certificate of Incorporation; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 1983 Amended Certificate of Incorporation

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 1983 Amended Certificate of Incorporation; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 SEDC Articles of Incorporation

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 SEDC Articles of Incorporation; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Buckley, D.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service to State of New York Authorities Budget Office; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service to Office of New York State Attorney General; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/22/2021; Received: 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Notice of Petition and Summons; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 30 ABO December 4, 2020 Email; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 29 SEDC November 30, 2020 Letter; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 28 ABO November 24, 2020 Email; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 27 SEDC November 20, 2020 Letter; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 Investor Benefits; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 Member Investors; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 Board of Governors; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 Board Members; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 Amended By-Laws; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 SEDC By-Laws; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 2010 Amended Certificate of Incorporation; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 1983 Amended Certificate of Incorporation; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 SEDC Articles of Incorporation; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Neidl, C.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less