Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 19:14:56 (UTC).

SANTIAGO ROCA v. 58 GERRY ST, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 SANTIAGO ROCA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 58 GERRY ST, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Debra Silber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Debra Silber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santiago Roca

Defendants

PARKVIEW BUILDERS, LLC

58 GERRY ST, LLC

B T GENERAL BUILDERS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

gastman, gregory

Attorney at Gorayeb & Associates, PC

Defendant Attorneys

FABIANI, JOHN VINCENT

Attorney at FABIANI COHEN & HALL, LLP

REBOH, JOELLE

Attorney at FABIANI, COHEN & HALL LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DTD 01/29/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DTD 01/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

ANSWER (AMENDED) Verified amended answer to amended verified complaint

ANSWER (AMENDED) Verified amended answer to amended verified complaint; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

ANSWER verified answer to amended complaint and verification

ANSWER verified answer to amended complaint and verification; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Mot. Seq. # 1

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Mot. Seq. # 1; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Supplemental Summons And Amended Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Supplemental Summons And Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons And Complaint And Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons And Complaint And Answer; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request For Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request For Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

DEMAND FOR: combined discovery demands

DEMAND FOR: combined discovery demands; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS demand for bps

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS demand for bps; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

ANSWER answer and verification

ANSWER answer and verification; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DTD 01/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Verified amended answer to amended verified complaint; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER verified answer to amended complaint and verification; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Mot. Seq. # 1; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Supplemental Summons And Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons And Complaint And Answer; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice Of Motion; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request For Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request For Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: combined discovery demands; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS demand for bps; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER answer and verification; Filed By: Fabiani, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less