This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 01/20/2023 at 05:12:47 (UTC).

SANTANDER BANK NA v. ERIC MOORE et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 SANTANDER BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ERIC MOORE. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Greene, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gina C Capone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gina C Capone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTANDER BANK NA

Defendants

Eric Moore

INTERCOUNTY SUPP INC

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE LLC

HSCB NEVADA NA

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RYAN, EILEEN MARIE

SCHAEFER, RANDY J.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #7)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #7)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #7) W - August 16, 2022 Decision & Order

EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #7) W - August 16, 2022 Decision & Order; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #7) V - May 16, 2022 Decision & Order

EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #7) V - May 16, 2022 Decision & Order; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #7) U - Entered Discontinuance

EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #7) U - Entered Discontinuance; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #7) T - Trial Loan Modification

EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #7) T - Trial Loan Modification; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #7) S - July 2019 Notice of Sale, OSC Notification & Signed OSC

EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #7) S - July 2019 Notice of Sale, OSC Notification & Signed OSC; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #7) R - Order Terminating Automatic Stay

EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #7) R - Order Terminating Automatic Stay; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #7) Q - Sept 2016 Notice of Sale & BK filing

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #7) Q - Sept 2016 Notice of Sale & BK filing; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) A - Name Change Information

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) A - Name Change Information; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

ORDER - OTHER Motion Seq. 4 Decision & Order

ORDER - OTHER Motion Seq. 4 Decision & Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2022; Received: 08/12/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 07/14/2022; Received: 07/14/2022

AFFIRMATION Notice of Conversion to eFiling with Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION Notice of Conversion to eFiling with Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 07/11/2022; Received: 07/11/2022

APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING

APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #7) W - August 16, 2022 Decision & Order; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #7) V - May 16, 2022 Decision & Order; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #7) U - Entered Discontinuance; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #7) T - Trial Loan Modification; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #7) S - July 2019 Notice of Sale, OSC Notification & Signed OSC; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #7) R - Order Terminating Automatic Stay; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #7) Q - Sept 2016 Notice of Sale & BK filing; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #7) P - Entered JFS; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) B - Note; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) A - Name Change Information; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Motion Seq. 4 Decision & Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2022; Received: 08/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 07/14/2022; Received: 07/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Notice of Conversion to eFiling with Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ryan, E.; Filed: 07/11/2022; Received: 07/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less