This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 09/09/2020 at 14:35:39 (UTC).

SANTANDER BANK, N.A. v. CHARLES GREEN et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 SANTANDER BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHARLES GREEN. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah H Karalunas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Deborah H Karalunas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTANDER BANK, N.A.

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Charles Green

John Doe

RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC

M GOLDBERG & SONS SYRACUSE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

Attorney at Calamar

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

FAY, RICHARD PATRICK

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

ROSENFELD, STEVEN

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE M GOLDBERG & SONS SYRACUSE INC. AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE M GOLDBERG & SONS SYRACUSE INC. AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARLES GREEN AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARLES GREEN AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARLES GREEN 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARLES GREEN 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D of Complaint: Schedule D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D of Complaint: Schedule D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C of Complaint: Schedule C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C of Complaint: Schedule C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B of Complaint-Legal Desc.: Schedule B + Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B of Complaint-Legal Desc.: Schedule B + Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A of Complaint-Note: Schedule A + Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A of Complaint-Note: Schedule A + Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE M GOLDBERG & SONS SYRACUSE INC. AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARLES GREEN AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHARLES GREEN 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D of Complaint: Schedule D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C of Complaint: Schedule C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B of Complaint-Legal Desc.: Schedule B + Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A of Complaint-Note: Schedule A + Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosenfeld, S.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less