This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:47:21 (UTC).

SANDRA CAMPBELL JEFFRIES v. CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 SANDRA CAMPBELL JEFFRIES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph E Capella. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph E Capella

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Campbell jeffries as Executrix of The Estate of VIRGINIA CAMPBELL DECEASED

Defendants

CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC

INTERFAITH MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DUFFY, MICHAEL E

Attorney at DUFFY & DUFFY

SMITH, DAMIEN

Attorney at DUFFY & DUFFY, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTOFORO, CHRISTINA R.

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

STEA TURIANO, CHRISTINE A

Attorney at KAUFMAN BORGEEST & RYAN LLP

HAYS, PETER BRUIN

Attorney at Rubin, Paterniti, Gonzalez, Kaufman

SILVERMAN, STEVEN M.

Attorney at DOPF P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 10/28/2019.

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 10/28/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Bill of Particulars

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS BP - Interfaith Hospital

BILL OF PARTICULARS BP - Interfaith Hospital; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS BP - Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation

BILL OF PARTICULARS BP - Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

DEMAND FOR: Letter to Dopf, P.C requesting records

DEMAND FOR: Letter to Dopf, P.C requesting records; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Commencement of Action, Suit, Claim, Demand on Account of personal Injuries Pursuant to NY(..)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Commencement of Action, Suit, Claim, Demand on Account of personal Injuries Pursuant to NY(..); Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC.; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC.; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE INTERFAITH MEDICAL CENTER

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE INTERFAITH MEDICAL CENTER; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 10/28/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS BP - Interfaith Hospital; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS BP - Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Letter to Dopf, P.C requesting records; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Commencement of Action, Suit, Claim, Demand on Account of personal Injuries Pursuant to NY Social Services; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Commencement; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE INTERFAITH MEDICAL CENTER; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC.; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CENTER FOR NURSING AND REHABILITATION, INC.; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE INTERFAITH MEDICAL CENTER; Filed By: Duffy, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Smith, D.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less