This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:06:16 (UTC).

Samuel Palace et al - v. - Otis Walker

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Samuel Palace filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Otis Walker. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Menachem mendel Pershin

Samuel Palace

Defendant

Otis Walker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH J

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph J. Schwartz, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

ORDER - OTHER DATED 2/21/19

ORDER - OTHER DATED 2/21/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) dtd 2/7/19 nsp.

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) dtd 2/7/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #5)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #5); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Mortgage Letter & Bank Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Mortgage Letter & Bank Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Order to Show Cause

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Contract; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER DATED 2/21/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) dtd 2/7/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #5); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Mortgage Letter & Bank Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Notice of Settlement & Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Contract; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Schwartz, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less