This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 14:28:53 (UTC).

SAMANTHA PHILLIPS v. FAMILY SERVICES NETWORK OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 SAMANTHA PHILLIPS filed an Other lawsuit against FAMILY SERVICES NETWORK OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Wavny Toussaint. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Wavny Toussaint

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samantha Phillips

Defendants

Randy A Powell

FAMILY SERVICES NETWORK OF NEW YORK

Emilio Alberto Trinidad rivas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTELLO, JOSEPH THOMAS

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph Martello

Defendant Attorneys

WEISSMAN, AMY S

Attorney at MARSHALL, CONWAY & BRADLEY P.C.

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

Attorney at BAKER, McEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, PC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Martello, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Martello, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

ANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS

ANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Emilio Alberto

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Emilio Alberto; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Randy A. Powell

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Randy A. Powell; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Family Services Network of New York

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Family Services Network of New York; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Martello, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Martello, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Weissman, A.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Emilio Alberto; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Randy A. Powell; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Family Services Network of New York; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Martello, J. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less