This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:05:56 (UTC).

S. M. et al - v. - The Motor Vehicle Accident Indemnification Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 S M filed an Other lawsuit against The Motor Vehicle Accident Indemnification Corporation. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Denise O'donoghue individually

S. M. an infant by his mother and natural guardian Denise O'Donoghue

Defendant

The Motor Vehicle Accident Indemnification Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, DAVID R.

Attorney at David R. Lewis, P.C.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Settlement offer letter from MVAIC

EXHIBIT(S) - A Settlement offer letter from MVAIC; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE Duplicate, dtd 10/20/17

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE Duplicate, dtd 10/20/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

PETITION Petitioner of Denise O'Donoghue

PETITION Petitioner of Denise O'Donoghue; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE dtd 10/11/17 nsp

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE dtd 10/11/17 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE HRA non assertion of lien letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE HRA non assertion of lien letter; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Physician's Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Infant Compromise Order

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Infant Compromise Order; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE Duplicate, dtd 10/20/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE dtd 10/11/17 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE HRA non assertion of lien letter; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Settlement offer letter from MVAIC; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) Infant Compromise Order; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Petitioner of Denise O'Donoghue; Filed By: Lewis, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less