This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:33:44 (UTC).

S. H. I. et al v. THE NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 S H I filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against THE NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is George J. Silver - Mmc. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

George J. Silver - Mmc

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Md kamroul Hasan , Individually

S. H. I. an infant, by his Parent and Natural Guardian, MD KAMROUL HASAN

Defendants

Sandra M Angus MD

Stavros Lazarou MD

THE NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION d/b/a NORTH CENTRAL BRONX HOSPITAL

Anthony Yao Dorbu MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAS, LUIS F

Attorney at RAS ASSOCIATES, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

ROTH, WAYNE MARC

Attorney at VIGORITO, BARKER, PORTER & PATTERSON, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 11, 2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 11, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection for Contracts

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection for Contracts; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

NOTICE TO ADMIT 2nd Notice to Admit

NOTICE TO ADMIT 2nd Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 09/04/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 09/04/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Physical Inspection and Preservation of Evidence

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Physical Inspection and Preservation of Evidence; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

NOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit

NOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical Malpractice Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical Malpractice Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition to Lazarou

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition to Lazarou; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition to Health and Hospital Corporation

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition to Health and Hospital Corporation; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer of Sandra M. Angus, M.D.

ANSWER Verified Answer of Sandra M. Angus, M.D.; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars for NYC H+H

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars for NYC H+H; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer of NYC H+H

ANSWER Verified Answer of NYC H+H; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service of SOP upon Dft Stavros Lazarou. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service of SOP upon Dft Stavros Lazarou. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of service of service of process upon all named defendants to this action. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of service of service of process upon all named defendants to this action. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

COMPLAINT *Corrected* Complaint_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT *Corrected* Complaint_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Certificate of Merit_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Certificate of Merit_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

SUMMONS *Corrected* Summons_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS *Corrected* Summons_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: DECEMBER 11, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection for Contracts; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT 2nd Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 09/04/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Physical Inspection and Preservation of Evidence; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical Malpractice Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition to Lazarou; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition to Health and Hospital Corporation; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition to Dorbu; Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for VBOP as to Sandra M. Angus, M.D.; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer of Sandra M. Angus, M.D.; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars for NYC H+H; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer of NYC H+H; Filed By: Roth, W. - filed by Vigorito Barker Porter & Patterson, LLP; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service of SOP upon Dft Stavros Lazarou. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of service of service of process upon all named defendants to this action. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT *Corrected* Complaint_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Certificate of Merit_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS *Corrected* Summons_redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ras, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less