This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 06/05/2021 at 10:17:11 (UTC).

S. D. v. GREEN CHIMNEYS CHILDREN'S SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 S D filed an Other lawsuit against GREEN CHIMNEYS CHILDREN'S SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven M Jaeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Steven M Jaeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ds

Defendant

GREEN CHIMNEYS CHILDRENS SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERMAN, JEFFREY MARC

Attorney at Herman Law

Defendant Attorney

RUTHERFORD, DAVID S

Attorney at RUTHERFORD & CHRISTIE, LLP

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2021; Received: 06/02/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/26/2021; Received: 05/26/2021

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/26/2021; Received: 05/26/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/20/2021; Received: 05/20/2021

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affidavit of Plaintiff in Support of Order to Show Cause - Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affidavit of Plaintiff in Support of Order to Show Cause - Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) OSC(proposed)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) OSC(proposed); Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2021; Received: 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/26/2021; Received: 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/26/2021; Received: 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/20/2021; Received: 05/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affidavit of Plaintiff in Support of Order to Show Cause - Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) OSC(proposed); Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Herman, J.; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less