This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:14:37 (UTC).

S B v. THE CITY OF NEW YORK, et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 S B filed an Other lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mitchell J Danziger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mitchell J Danziger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S B an infant, by her mother and natural guardian, FATOUMATA KOITE and FATOUMATA KOITE, Individually,

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK,

DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greenberg, Alan M.

Attorney at GREENBERG LAW P.C.

Defendant Attorney

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Notice of Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Aff of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Aff of Good Faith; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 05/21/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 05/21/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons Complaint; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: JANUARY 14, 2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: JANUARY 14, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Amended Notice of Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Amended Notice of Claim; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) 50h hearing transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) 50h hearing transcript; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 6/19/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 6/19/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: JANUARY 14, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 6/19/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 05/21/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Amended Notice of Claim; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons Complaint; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) 50h hearing transcript; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Aff of Good Faith; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Greenberg, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less