This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:32:48 (UTC).

Ryan Waid v. City of Jamestown, New York et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Ryan Waid filed an Other lawsuit against City of Jamestown, New York. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn W Keane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0363

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lynn W Keane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Waid

Defendants

City of Jamestown Fire Department

CITY OF JAMESTOWN NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perri Roberts, Diane M.

Attorney at LIPSITZ GREEN SCIME CAMBRIA LLP

Defendant Attorney

MACHELOR, KRISTIN M.

Attorney at The Machelor Law Firm

 

Court Documents

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) PERB decision

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) PERB decision; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Collective bargaining agreement between the City of Yonkers and its Firefighters Union

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Collective bargaining agreement between the City of Yonkers and its Firefighters Union; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Correspondence dated October 23, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Correspondence dated October 23, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation of Diane M. Perri Roberts, Esq.

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation of Diane M. Perri Roberts, Esq.; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) CBA Grievance Procedure

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) CBA Grievance Procedure; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Correspondence dated June 24, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Correspondence dated June 24, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit in Support of Application and Order To Show Cause

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit in Support of Application and Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 *Corrected* E-mail dated February 27, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 *Corrected* E-mail dated February 27, 2020; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 *Corrected* Respondents correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 *Corrected* Respondents correspondence; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 *Corrected* E-mail dated February 26, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 *Corrected* E-mail dated February 26, 2020; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 *Corrected* Jamestown Firefighters' Union consensus

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 *Corrected* Jamestown Firefighters' Union consensus; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 *Corrected* Policy Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 *Corrected* Policy Statement; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Ruling by Arbitrator Foster

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Ruling by Arbitrator Foster; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

PETITION *Corrected* Notice of Petition/Application and Petition/Application to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to CPLR Secti ... show more

PETITION *Corrected* Notice of Petition/Application and Petition/Application to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to CPLR Secti ... show more; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) PERB decision; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Collective bargaining agreement between the City of Yonkers and its Firefighters Union; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Correspondence dated October 23, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation of Diane M. Perri Roberts, Esq.; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1); Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) CBA Grievance Procedure; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b *Corrected* Correspondence from Office of the NYS Comptroller; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A *Corrected* Correspondence dated June 24, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit in Support of Application and Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 *Corrected* E-mail dated February 27, 2020; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 *Corrected* Respondents correspondence; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 *Corrected* E-mail dated February 26, 2020; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 *Corrected* Jamestown Firefighters' Union consensus; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 *Corrected* Policy Statement; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Ruling by Arbitrator Foster; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected* Notice of Petition/Application and Petition/Application to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to CPLR Section 7503; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less