This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 12:02:21 (UTC).

RYAN WAID v. CITY OF JAMESTOWN ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 RYAN WAID filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF JAMESTOWN. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Dillon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0806

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Waid

Defendant

CITY OF JAMESTOWN ET AL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perri Roberts, Diane M.

Attorney at LIPSITZ GREEN SCIME CAMBRIA LLP

Defendant Attorney

MACHELOR, KRISTIN M.

Attorney at The Machelor Law Firm

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Via E-Filing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Via E-Filing; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order with Notice of Entry dated November 11, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Order with Notice of Entry dated November 11, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #3)

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Transcript dated September 16, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Transcript dated September 16, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Transcript dated August 5, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Transcript dated August 5, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) COJ Letter Re: Proposed Order Objected to by Opposing Counsel

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) COJ Letter Re: Proposed Order Objected to by Opposing Counsel; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - C correspondence; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Memo

EXHIBIT(S) - B Memo; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Civil Service Description

EXHIBIT(S) - A Civil Service Description; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT Harvey Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT Harvey Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER

RJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Via E-Filing; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Order with Notice of Entry dated November 11, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Transcript dated September 16, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Transcript dated August 5, 2019; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) COJ Letter Re: Proposed Order Objected to by Opposing Counsel; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #2) *Corrected* COJ Proposed Order Dismissing Art 78; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D correspondence; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C correspondence; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Memo; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Civil Service Description; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Perri Roberts, D.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Harvey Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Machelor, K.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less