Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 04:00:24 (UTC).

RUSSELL LEAVITT - v. - A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 RUSSELL LEAVITT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel J. Mendez. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel J. Mendez

 

Party Details

Defendants

LIQUIDATING REICHOLD, INC. f/k/a Reichhold, Inc., Reichhold Liquidation, Inc. and Reichhold Chemicals, Inc.

Gardner Denver, Inc.

Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Individually, and as successor to Tappan and Copes-Vulcan

FMC CORPORATION,

GRINNELL LLC

Occidental Chemical Corporation

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL),

Cytec Industries, Inc. Individually and as successor in interest to Fiberite, Inc.

GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.,

PNUEMO ABEX LLC, successor in interest to Abex Corporation

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

ITT LLC.,

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PLENCO

FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C.,

WARREN PUMPS, LLC

Rogers Corporation

KARNAK CORPORATION

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ROHANI, SAMAE

Attorney at Haworth Barber & Gerstman, LLC

HSU, MARK KANG

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

MESSEMER, CYNTHIA KULAS

Attorney at HODGES WALSH MESSEMER & BURKE, LLP

HODGES, GEORGE STEPHEN

Attorney at HODGES WALSH & MESSEMER, LLP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

YOUNG, CINDY

Attorney at Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

DWYER, ELIZABETH MEGHAN

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

MUNDO, ANDREW JOHN

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

HAAG, SARAH RUTH

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

HOURIZADEH, ARSHIA

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

Other Attorneys

DREKSLER, ADAM SEAN

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

LASALA, JOSEPH P

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH & MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

SILVERMAN, MICHAEL DAVID

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

CALCAGNO, TERANCE ROWE

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

THOMPSON, JENNIFER JASMINE WINNIE

HOLLMAN, LAURA B.

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS

WEINSTEIN, JASON PETER

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg

36 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) as to Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) as to Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation; Filed By: Goodearl, D.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Pneumo Abex LLC

NOTICE OF ENTRY Pneumo Abex LLC; Filed By: Sargente, A. - filed by HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Morse TEC

NOTICE OF ENTRY Morse TEC; Filed By: Dilonardo, A.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Allen Bradley's Executed Stip of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Allen Bradley's Executed Stip of Discontinuance; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Plastics Engineering Company

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Plastics Engineering Company; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

DECISION / ORDER ON MOTION - SHORT FORM Closes out motion seq. no. 10, motion for summary judgment, in ccis; motion opened in error

DECISION / ORDER ON MOTION - SHORT FORM Closes out motion seq. no. 10, motion for summary judgment, in ccis; motion opened in error; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Rogers Jx Letter Ex. 3: 11.26.19 Stay Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Rogers Jx Letter Ex. 3: 11.26.19 Stay Order; Filed By: Cullinane, K.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Rogers Jx Letter Ex. 2: Leavitt-Rogers Appellate Oral Argument Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Rogers Jx Letter Ex. 2: Leavitt-Rogers Appellate Oral Argument Transcript; Filed By: Cullinane, K.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Plastics Engineering Company

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Plastics Engineering Company; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

ANSWER Please disregard this filing. Please refer to document # 42 which is the corrected document.

ANSWER Please disregard this filing. Please refer to document # 42 which is the corrected document.; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Cooper Industries, LLC, Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Cooper Industries, LLC, Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kim, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weitz, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Weitz, J.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weitz, J.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

538 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) as to Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation; Filed By: Goodearl, D.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Pneumo Abex LLC; Filed By: Sargente, A. - filed by HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Morse TEC; Filed By: Dilonardo, A.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Allen Bradley's Executed Stip of Discontinuance; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Plastics Engineering Company; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION / ORDER ON MOTION - SHORT FORM Closes out motion seq. no. 10, motion for summary judgment, in ccis; motion opened in error; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Rogers Jx Letter Ex. 3: 11.26.19 Stay Order; Filed By: Cullinane, K.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Rogers Jx Letter Ex. 2: Leavitt-Rogers Appellate Oral Argument Transcript; Filed By: Cullinane, K.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Rogers Jx Letter Ex. 1: Weitz & Cullinane October Communications; Filed By: Cullinane, K.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
530 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt of a Suplemental Summons and Amended Complaint and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Plastics Engineering Company; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Please disregard this filing. Please refer to document # 42 which is the corrected document.; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Cooper Industries, LLC, Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kim, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weitz, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Weitz, J.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weitz, J.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less