This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:59:51 (UTC).

RUSLANA MEDNIKOVA - v. - XIN O JIN

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 RUSLANA MEDNIKOVA filed an Other lawsuit against XIN O JIN. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruslana Mednikova

Defendant and Petitioner

Xin O Jin

Respondent

DANYLO MEDNIKOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOGORAZ, KARINE

Attorney at Bogoraz Law Group

Petitioner Attorney

ADAM PHILIP SHAPIRO (0450438338.2)

Defendant Attorney

SHAPIRO, ADAM PHILIP

Attorney at Law Office of Karen L. Lawrence

Respondent Attorney

DIMITRY BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Affidavit of Kellyann Carini With Exhibit A to Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Affidavit of Kellyann Carini With Exhibit A to Affidavit; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Cashed Draft

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Cashed Draft; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Release

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Release; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Answer to Third-Party Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Answer to Third-Party Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Third-Party Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Third-Party Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ANSWER answer with bp and combined demands

ANSWER answer with bp and combined demands; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third-Party Summons and Complaint

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third-Party Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bogoraz, K.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Affidavit of Kellyann Carini With Exhibit A to Affidavit; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Cashed Draft; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Release; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Answer to Third-Party Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Third-Party Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER answer with bp and combined demands; Filed By: Benjamin, D.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third-Party Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bogoraz, K.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bogoraz, K.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less