This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 15:15:10 (UTC).

RUSLAN KOMITSEV v. T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 RUSLAN KOMITSEV filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against T G NICKEL ASSOCIATES, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Doris Ling-Cohan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Doris Ling-Cohan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruslan Komitsev

Defendants

SITE 2 DSA OWNER LLC

L&M DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS INC.

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

PRO SAFETY SERVICES LLC

T.G. NICKEL & ASSOCIATES, LLC

DELANCEY STREET ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATZ, NOAH R

Attorney at Wingate Russotti Shapiro & Halperin, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ESCHMANN, PAUL ANDREW

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

BILA, ANTHONY

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT TORT DIVISION

Corporation Counsel, Zachary Carter

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

MAZZALONGA, STEPHEN

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT, OFFICE OF THE CORPORATION COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Combined Demands

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Combined Demands; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Combined Demands; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Housing Development Fund Corp.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Housing Development Fund Corp.; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Theater LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Theater LLC; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Residential LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Residential LLC; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Commercial LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Commercial LLC; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The City of New York

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The City of New York; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Combined Demands; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Combined Demands; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Housing Development Fund Corp.; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Theater LLC; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Residential LLC; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Site 2 DSA Commercial LLC; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The City of New York; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Eschmann, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Katz, N.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less