This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 19:05:29 (UTC).

Royston R Meredith Sr et al - v. - Interamerican Mortgage Corp.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 Royston R Meredith Sr filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Interamerican Mortgage Corp. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dawn A Meredith

Royston R Meredith SR

Defendant

Interamerican Mortgage Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JULKA, HARVINDER PAL

Attorney at Law Offices of Harvinder P Julka

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT dated 5/3/18

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT dated 5/3/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Proposed Order and Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Proposed Order and Judgment; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of further Service on Defendant

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of further Service on Defendant; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Defendant

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Defendant; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint filed

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint filed; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT dated 5/3/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Proposed Order and Judgment; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of further Service on Defendant; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service on Defendant; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint filed; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Julka, H.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less