This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:12:06 (UTC).

Roselyn Acampora - v. - Alexandra Nevs et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2017 Roselyn Acampora filed an Other lawsuit against Alexandra Nevs. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roselyn Acampora

Defendants

ABC CORP. I-X

JOHN DOE I-X

Alexandra Nevs

XYZ EMPLOYER I-X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALCAGNO, ANDREW J.

Attorney at Calcagno & Associates

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDMAN, BRENDAN FORREST

Attorney at Lasater & Martin P.C.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2018; Received: 11/15/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) police report

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) police report; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) summons and cmplt

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) summons and cmplt; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001)

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001); Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) EXHIBITS A-D TO MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) EXHIBITS A-D TO MOTION; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001) EXPARTE MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001) EXPARTE MOTION; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 06/04/2017; Received: 06/04/2017

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Nicole Lesperance; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/15/2018; Received: 11/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/27/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 02/26/2018; Received: 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) police report; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) summons and cmplt; Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Friedman, B. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001); Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) EXHIBITS A-D TO MOTION; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001) EXPARTE MOTION; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 06/04/2017; Received: 06/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less