This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 15:21:45 (UTC).

Rose Land and Finance Corp. v. Brian Hokanson et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Rose Land and Finance Corp filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brian Hokanson. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0018

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSE LAND + FINANCE CORP

Defendants

Discover Bank

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Melissa Simmons

Brian Hokanson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, JEFFREY S

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2)

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2)

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2)

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Affidavit of Service of RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Affidavit of Service of RJI; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LVNV

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LVNV; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE No John Does

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE No John Does; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Melissa Simmons

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Melissa Simmons; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Brian Hokanson

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Brian Hokanson; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons with notice, Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons with notice, Verified Complaint; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #2); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Discover Bank; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Affidavit of Service of RJI; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LVNV; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE No John Does; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Melissa Simmons; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Brian Hokanson; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons with notice, Verified Complaint; Filed By: Greene, J.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less