Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 07:28:44 (UTC).

ROSE ECKRICH, as Executrix for the Estate of THOMAS L. ECKRICH, and ROSE ECKRICH, Individually v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 ROSE ECKRICH, as Executrix for the Estate of THOMAS L ECKRICH, and ROSE ECKRICH, Individually filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel J. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel J. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSE ECKRICH, as Executrix for the Estate of THOMAS L. ECKRICH, and ROSE ECKRICH, Individually

Defendants

DAP, INC

SPIRAX SARCO, INC.

FMC CORPORATION,

GRINNELL LLC

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

CROWN BOILER CO.,

ROPER PUMP COMPANY

GARDNER DENVER, INC

KAMCO SUPPLY CORP

ITT LLC.,

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC

BURNHAM, LLC,

BRYANT HEATING & COOLING SYSTEMS

CARRIER CORPORATION

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFMAN, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

MESSEMER, CYNTHIA KULAS

Attorney at HODGES WALSH MESSEMER & BURKE, LLP

HODGES, GEORGE STEPHEN

Attorney at HODGES WALSH & MESSEMER, LLP

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

WAYNE, EVA S

Attorney at MALABY & BRADLEY

NOVAKIDIS, STEPHEN

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

PASCARELLA, LISA M.

Attorney at PASCARELLA DIVITA LINDENBAUM & TOMASZEWSKI

Other Attorneys

HAAG, SARAH RUTH

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

SORENSEN, BRIAN JONATHAN

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

TAMASCO, MATTHEW SCOTT

Attorney at SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP

CHIARAVALLOTI, NATHANIEL DEREK JAY

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly, P.C.

CALCAGNO, TERANCE ROWE

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

REGINA, GIOVANNI

Attorney at WATERS MCPHERSON MCNEILL

SHULTZ, WILLIAM D.

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

HOWARTH, JOHN SAMUEL

Attorney at WILBRAHAM, LAWLER & BUBA

STEINER, MARISSA FALLON

Attorney at Barry McTiernan & Moore LLC

TEMPESTA, CAROL MARIA

Attorney at Marks O'Neill O'Brien Courtney & Doherty

32 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as against Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. formerly known as Dunham-Bush, Inc. Only

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as against Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. formerly known as Dunham-Bush, Inc. Only; Filed By: Tamasco, M.; Filed: 05/26/2020; Received: 05/26/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2020; Received: 05/07/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 POF

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 POF; Filed By: Kaufman, D.; Filed: 04/17/2020; Received: 04/17/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Grinnell LLC

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Grinnell LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH K

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH K; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH J

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH J; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH I

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH I; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH H

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH H; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

ANSWER Fairbanks - Acknowledgment of Receipt

ANSWER Fairbanks - Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Regina, G.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

ANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt

ANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company; Filed By: Marin, R.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brandis, A.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

222 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as against Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. formerly known as Dunham-Bush, Inc. Only; Filed By: Tamasco, M.; Filed: 05/26/2020; Received: 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2020; Received: 05/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 POF; Filed By: Kaufman, D.; Filed: 04/17/2020; Received: 04/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Grinnell LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH K; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH J; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH I; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH H; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Aff Opp MSJ-Utica Boiler EXH G; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Roper Answer; Filed By: Novakidis, S.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Fairbanks - Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Regina, G.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company; Filed By: Marin, R.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brandis, A.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less