This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 13:37:57 (UTC).

ROSE CREEK, LLC et al v. CLAW GOLF MANAGEMENT, INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 ROSE CREEK, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CLAW GOLF MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Anthony J Paris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Anthony J Paris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSE CREEK, LLC

KA-CO REALTY, LLC

Defendants

CLAW GOLF MANAGEMENT, INC

Christopher L. Lawson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAFFE, CHAIM J

Attorney at SCOLARO, SHULMAN, COHEN, FETTER & BURSTEIN, P.C.

MAHR, DOUGLAS JOHN

Attorney at SCOLARO, FETTER, GRIZANTI, MCGOUGH & KING, P.C.

 

Court Documents

EXECUTION

EXECUTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Signed Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Signed Order; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) Amend Judgment

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) Amend Judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #1); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Statement of Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Statement of Judgment; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Amended Statement of Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Amended Statement of Judgment; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

ORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED)

ORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 2nd Mailing Against Corp. 3215(g)(4)(i)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 2nd Mailing Against Corp. 3215(g)(4)(i); Filed By: Mahr, D.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXECUTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Signed Order; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) Amend Judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #1); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Statement of Judgment; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Amended Statement of Judgment; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 2nd Mailing Against Corp. 3215(g)(4)(i); Filed By: Mahr, D.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Jaffe, C.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less