This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:53:51 (UTC).

ROSA M. EDWARDS - v. - VW CREDIT LEASING, LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 ROSA M EDWARDS filed an Other lawsuit against VW CREDIT LEASING, LTD. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosa M. Edwards

Defendants

Vincent A. Caravelli

VW CREDIT LEASING, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYNECKI, SCOTT E

Attorney at RUBENSTEIN & RYNECKI ESQS

Defendant Attorney

MCNAMARA, DANIEL J

Attorney at DeCICCO, GIBBONS & McNAMARA, P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Defendants' Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Defendants' Answer; Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

ORDER - OTHER dated 10/31/2018

ORDER - OTHER dated 10/31/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Jason William Tyng

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Jason William Tyng; Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

DEMAND FOR: Discovery

DEMAND FOR: Discovery; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

ORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part - dated 3/15/18

ORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part - dated 3/15/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 10/31/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part - dated 3/15/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Defendants' Answer; Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Jason William Tyng; Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Mcnamara, D. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/12/2018; Received: 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dtd 10/5/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Discovery; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Mcnamara, D.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less