This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 14:36:43 (UTC).

RONMEL BENITEZ PILALAO v. PARK REGIS APARTMENT CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 RONMEL BENITEZ PILALAO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PARK REGIS APARTMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Doris Ling-Cohan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Doris Ling-Cohan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronmel Benitez pilalao

Defendants and Petitioners

PRATT CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION INC

PARK REGIS APARTMENT CORPORATION

RBS RENOVATION CORP

Respondents

Gerald Fast System Corp.

RBS Renovation Corp.

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

gastman, gregory

Attorney at Gorayeb & Associates, PC

Petitioner Attorneys

ADAM CASIMIR WEISS

STEVEN D ZECCA ARIEL ALBERT BIVAS

Defendant Attorneys

WEISS, ADAM CASIMIR

Attorney at The Law Firm of Adam C. Weiss, PLLC

ZECCA, STEVEN D

Attorney at AHMUTY, DEMERS & MCMANUS, ESQS.

BIVAS, ARIEL ALBERT

Attorney at Ahmuty, Demers, & McManus

MARK, BRIAN F.

Attorney at HURWITZ & FINE, P.C.

MALANG, ELIZABETH E

Attorney at RYAN & CONLON, LLP

Respondent Attorney

ELIZABETH E MALANG

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

ANSWER Please disregard this filing. It was filed in error.

ANSWER Please disregard this filing. It was filed in error.; Filed By: Weiss, A.; Filed: 01/12/2020; Received: 01/12/2020

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) Supplemental Summons

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Collateral Source Information

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Collateral Source Information; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Medical Information

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Medical Information; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Expert Witness Information

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Expert Witness Information; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Bivas, A.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Please disregard this filing. It was filed in error.; Filed By: Weiss, A.; Filed: 01/12/2020; Received: 01/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands to ALL; Filed By: Malang, E.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination (Plaintiff); Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Collateral Source Information; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Medical Information; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Expert Witness Information; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint; Filed By: Mark, B.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less