This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 13:33:19 (UTC).

RONALD MCKENZIE v. GOING ART MOVERS INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 RONALD MCKENZIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOING ART MOVERS INC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Mckenzie

Defendants

Mario Antonio

GOING ART MOVERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALOMON, MICHAEL LAWRENCE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ZEMSKY & SALOMON, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

HATZIS, CONSTANTINE

Attorney at CHEVEN & KEELY

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mario Antonio - VTL service - mailing affidavit

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mario Antonio - VTL service - mailing affidavit; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mario Antonio - VTL service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mario Antonio - VTL service; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Hatzis, C.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Going Art Movers Inc. - service c/o Oscar F. Berrio in New York, NY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Going Art Movers Inc. - service c/o Oscar F. Berrio in New York, NY; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Going Art Movers Inc. - Secretary of State service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Going Art Movers Inc. - Secretary of State service; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mario Antonio - VTL service - mailing affidavit; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mario Antonio - VTL service; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Hatzis, C.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Going Art Movers Inc. - service c/o Oscar F. Berrio in New York, NY; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Going Art Movers Inc. - Secretary of State service; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Salomon, M. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less