This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 00:29:41 (UTC).

RONA FNU v. ANNALY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 RONA FNU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANNALY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4375

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rona Fnu

Defendant

ANNALY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIGUENZA, TEODORO XAVIER

STERN, DAVID SCOTT

Attorney at ELLIOTT STERN AND CALABRESE

Defendant Attorneys

ARCURI, ANDREW ANTHONY

Attorney at Kelly, Luglio & Arcuri, LLP

PAPOL, SHEELA M.

Attorney at Kelly, Luglio & Arcuri, LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. William K. Taylor

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. William K. Taylor; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Papol, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A -- Discovery Responses Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A -- Discovery Responses Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Merit of Plaintiff

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Merit of Plaintiff; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Cross Motion

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Cross Motion; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE (Motion #1)

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

DEMAND FOR: Supplemental Demand

DEMAND FOR: Supplemental Demand; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery & Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

DEMAND FOR: Notice Regarding Expert

DEMAND FOR: Notice Regarding Expert; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Siguenza, T.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Siguenza, T.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. William K. Taylor; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Papol, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Order Extending Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A -- Discovery Responses Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Merit of Plaintiff; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Cross Motion; Filed By: Stern, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Disclosure Demand; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Supplemental Demand; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice Regarding Expert; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Arcuri, A.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Siguenza, T.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Siguenza, T.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less