This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 07/13/2021 at 02:55:39 (UTC).

Ron Berie et al - v. - Shirley Ward et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Ron Berie filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Shirley Ward. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0475

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jennifer Berie

Ron Berie

C B

Defendants

D W

Jeffrey A Ward

Shirley Ward

Not Yet Classified

Rubino Law Firm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

RUBINO, JENNIELENA

Defendant Attorneys

NORFLEET, KRISTIN LEWIS

FELTER, KAREN GUYDER

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial scheduled to begin April 25, 2022

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial scheduled to begin April 25, 2022; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5) of Memorandum Decision and Order of the Hon. James P. McClusky, J.S.C.

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5) of Memorandum Decision and Order of the Hon. James P. McClusky, J.S.C.; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #5)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #5); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #5) Attorney Norfleet's Affirmation in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to File Brief filed in Fourth Department

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #5) Attorney Norfleet's Affirmation in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to File Brief filed in Fourth Department; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #5) Defendants/Appellants' Brief on Appeal filed with Fourth Department

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #5) Defendants/Appellants' Brief on Appeal filed with Fourth Department; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #5)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #5); Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #5) Affidavit of Service and Legal Back

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #5) Affidavit of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Decision dated March 26, 2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Decision dated March 26, 2021; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Copy of the Confirmation Notice attesting to the service of the electronically filed Notice of Appeal

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Copy of the Confirmation Notice attesting to the service of the electronically filed Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Requested Order from Atty Rubino

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Requested Order from Atty Rubino; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT of Chelsea Bango, L.M.S.W.

AFFIDAVIT of Chelsea Bango, L.M.S.W.; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE with attached Affidavit

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE with attached Affidavit; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A1 (Motion #1) Certificate of Good Standing

EXHIBIT(S) - A1 (Motion #1) Certificate of Good Standing; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2017; Received: 08/24/2018

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial scheduled to begin April 25, 2022; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5) of Memorandum Decision and Order of the Hon. James P. McClusky, J.S.C.; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #5); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #5) Attorney Norfleet's Affirmation in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to File Brief filed in Fourth Department; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #5) Defendants/Appellants' Brief on Appeal filed with Fourth Department; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #5); Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #5) Affidavit of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Decision dated March 26, 2021; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Copy of the Confirmation Notice attesting to the service of the electronically filed Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - zb (Motion #5) Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 03/30/2021; Received: 03/30/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
156 More Docket Entries
10/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2018
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Requested Order from Atty Rubino; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT of Chelsea Bango, L.M.S.W.; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2018
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE with attached Affidavit; Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2018
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Norfleet, K.; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A1 (Motion #1) Certificate of Good Standing; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Rubino, J.; Filed: 09/11/2018; Received: 09/11/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2017; Received: 08/24/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less