Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 19:13:17 (UTC).

Rodriguez A. Howard v. City of Buffalo et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Rodriguez A Howard filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against City of Buffalo. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez A. Howard

Defendants

City of Buffalo Department

Police officer christopher D. Bridgett

City of Buffalo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, WILLIAM PATRICK

Attorney at LIPSITZ GREEN SCIME CAMBRIA, LLP

Defendant Attorney

HUGGINS, MAEVE EILEEN

Attorney at City of Buffalo Department of Law Corporation Counsel's Office

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Huggins, M.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Police Officer Christopher D. Bridgett

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Police Officer Christopher D. Bridgett; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: City of Buffalo Police Department

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: City of Buffalo Police Department; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: City of Buffalo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: City of Buffalo; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Huggins, M.; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: Police Officer Christopher D. Bridgett; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: City of Buffalo Police Department; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS re: City of Buffalo; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Moore, W.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less