This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:04:52 (UTC).

Rocky Rameshwar et al - v. - The City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Rocky Rameshwar filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The City of New York. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony Delon Blair

Rocky Rameshwar

Defendants

The Department of Sanitation of the City of New York

The City of New York

Wanda F. Alvarez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAGOSTINO, MICHAEL

Attorney at BECKER & D'AGOSTINO, PC

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

PETIT, JENNIFER MARY

Attorney at NYC Law Department

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) dtd 11/6/19

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) dtd 11/6/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) NOI

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) NOI; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) CC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) CC Order; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) City PC Response

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) City PC Response; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) PC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) PC Order; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Consolidation Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Consolidation Order; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) City Answers

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) City Answers; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) S&C Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Wong, H.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Wong, H.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Wong, H.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) dtd 11/6/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) NOI; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) CC Order; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) City PC Response; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) PC Order; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Consolidation Order; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) City Answers; Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) S&C Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2); Filed By: Petit, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Wong, H.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Wong, H.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Wong, H.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dagostino, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less