This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/15/2023 at 19:51:58 (UTC).

Rocket Mortgage, LLC f/k/a Quicken Loans, LLC v. Keith R. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Rocket Mortgage, LLC f/k/a Quicken Loans, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Keith R Smith. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2023

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rocket Mortgage, LLC f/k/a Quicken Loans, LLC

Defendants

Keith R. Smith a/k/a Keith Smith

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 01/12/2023; Received: 01/12/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 01/12/2023; Received: 01/12/2023

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/27/2023; Received: 01/27/2023

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service by Mail

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/27/2023; Received: 01/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 01/12/2023; Received: 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 01/12/2023; Received: 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less