This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 22:12:03 (UTC).

Rochester Institute of Technology v. Emma Marion Speary

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 Rochester Institute of Technology filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Emma Marion Speary. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ontario County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rochester Institute of Technology

Defendant

Emma Marion Speary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAIG, PETER J.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non-Military Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Statement of Charges

EXHIBIT(S) - A Statement of Charges; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Statement of Charges; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Craig, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less