This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 16:10:16 (UTC).

Robert S. Santander v. Nidhi P. Shah et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Robert S Santander filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nidhi P Shah. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert S. Santander

Defendants

Nidhi P. Shah

Prakask R. Shah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OWENS, DAVID B.

Attorney at Molod, Spitz & DeSantis, P.C.

DESANTIS, SALVATORE J

Attorney at MOLOD SPITZ & DESANTIS, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

YONG, JEFFREY P

Attorney at MARTYN TOHER MARTYN & ROSSI

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 2/11/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 2/11/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Executed Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Executed Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 12/6/2019

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 12/6/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 12/10/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 12/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS FOR MOTION AND RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS FOR MOTION AND RJI; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ex C- Police Report

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ex C- Police Report; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) EX B - Defendants' Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) EX B - Defendants' Answer; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EX A-Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EX A-Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support with annexed photos

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support with annexed photos; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DEFT PRAKASK R. SHAH -NYSCEF NOTICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DEFT PRAKASK R. SHAH -NYSCEF NOTICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DEFT NIDHI P SHAH -NYSCEF Notice Summons and Verified Complaint

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DEFT NIDHI P SHAH -NYSCEF Notice Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 2/11/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Executed Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Desantis, S.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 12/6/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 12/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS FOR MOTION AND RJI; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ex C- Police Report; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) EX B - Defendants' Answer; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EX A-Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support with annexed photos; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DEFT PRAKASK R. SHAH -NYSCEF NOTICE SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DEFT NIDHI P SHAH -NYSCEF Notice Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less