Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:48:11 (UTC).

ROBERT PITTMAN et al - v. - LAURA ASCIONE

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 ROBERT PITTMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAURA ASCIONE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tammy Pittman

Robert Pittman

Defendant

Laura Ascione

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLE-HATCHARD, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at Law Office of Stephen J. Cole-Hatchard

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Defendant Attorney

SCHOENBERG, RICHARD B

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN TROP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

ADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Service to plaintiff's attorney

ADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Service to plaintiff's attorney; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Defendant Attorney Reply

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Defendant Attorney Reply; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney affirmation; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) notice of motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) notice of motion; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 11/09/2018; Received: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Service to plaintiff's attorney; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Defendant Attorney Reply; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE letter requesting an adjourment of summary judgment motion; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion #1) affidavit service; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney affirmation; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) notice of motion; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/03/2018; Received: 05/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less