This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 16:57:15 (UTC).

Robert L Beckman v. The New York State Department of Motor Vehicles Board and Driver Safety Department

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Robert L Beckman filed an Other lawsuit against The New York State Department of Motor Vehicles Board and Driver Safety Department. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1402

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert L Beckman

Defendant

Driver Safety department New york state department of motor vehicles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUTIGAM, ANDREW DAVID

Attorney at Brautigam & Brautigam LLP

Defendant Attorney

THORE, MELISSA HARDY

Attorney at NYS Office of the Attorney General

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2); Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Return

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Return; Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Regulations

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Regulations; Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #2)

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #2); Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from DMV

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from DMV; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Order of Suspension of Revocation

EXHIBIT(S) - C Order of Suspension of Revocation; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Physician's Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Physician's Statement; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Letter from DMV

EXHIBIT(S) - A Letter from DMV; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

NOTICE OF PETITION

NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2); Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Return; Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Regulations; Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #2); Filed By: Thore, M.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from DMV; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Order of Suspension of Revocation; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Physician's Statement; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Letter from DMV; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #2); Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Brautigam, A.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less