Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 03:57:24 (UTC).

ROBERT GILLEN et al - v. - ABB, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 ROBERT GILLEN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, INC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara Jaffe. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Barbara Jaffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Gillen

Defendants

WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC. individually and as successor to and doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC individually, as successor to and doing business as Foster Wheeler Corporation

BW/IP, INC. formerly known as Borg Warner Industrial Products Inc., a former subsidiary of and successor to Borg Warner Corporation and Byron Jackson Pumps

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC individually, as successor to and doing business as Georgia-Pacific Corporation

MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

METRO-NORTH COMMUTER RAIL

YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC individually, as successor to and doing business as Yuba Heat Transfer Corp.

ELLIOTT COMPANY individually, as successor to and doing business as Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.

TISHMAN LIQUIDATING CORP. formerly known as Tishman Realty & Construction Co., Inc.

VIKING PUMP INC.

MARIO & DIBNO PLASTERING CO., INC.

HOMASOTE COMPANY

ASBEKA INDUSTRIES OF NEW YORK, INC. individually and as successor to Asbeka Asbestos Corp.

CITY OF NEW YORK, THE

WEIL-McLAIN a division of the Marley-Wylain Company, a subsidiary of The Marley Company, LLC

GRINNELL LLC individually, as successor to and doing business as Grinnell Corporation, Grinnell Fire Protection Systems Company, Inc., ITT Grinnell Valve Co. Inc. and Kennedy Valve Mfg. Co.

PROGRESS LIGHTING, INC.

BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC individually, as successor to and doing business as Belden Wire and Cable Company and Belden, Inc.

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

CECERE, FRANK A

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

HSU, MARK KANG

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

TURBERT, KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at Clyde & Co

MASSIMI, LISA MARIE

Attorney at CARUSO, SMITH, PICINI, PC

GARRY, STEVEN EDWARD

Attorney at Costello Shea & Gaffney LLP

VINCE, DANIEL PETER

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

Other Attorneys

HAAG, SARAH RUTH

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

VEGA, DENNIS E.

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

MERCHANT, JOEL ALEXANDER

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.

PASCARELLA, LISA M.

Attorney at PASCARELLA DIVITA LINDENBAUM & TOMASZEWSKI

SCHAFFER, DAVID P

Attorney at MALABY & BRADLEY LLC

PEHUSH, TARA LYNNE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

MESSEMER, CYNTHIA KULAS

Attorney at HODGES WALSH MESSEMER & BURKE, LLP

HONEYGAN, SIMONE MUREEN

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

HODGES, GEORGE STEPHEN

Attorney at HODGES WALSH & BURKE, LLP

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

MUNDO, ANDREW JOHN

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

44 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) As to Yuba Heat Transfer LLC

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) As to Yuba Heat Transfer LLC; Filed By: Cecere, F.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: O'Rourke, P. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/02/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance as to Graybar Electric Company, Inc.

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance as to Graybar Electric Company, Inc.; Filed By: O'Rourke, P. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/02/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Port Authority of New York and New Jersey; Filed By: Mckeown, M.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Viking Pump, Inc.

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Viking Pump, Inc.; Filed By: Hsu, M.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) David Fabricators Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) David Fabricators Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Angiolillo, J.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Signed Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Flowserve US

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Signed Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Flowserve US; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Elliott Company

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Elliott Company; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) As against defendant Copes-Vulcan, Inc.

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) As against defendant Copes-Vulcan, Inc.; Filed By: Hodges, G.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mccann, T.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

488 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) As to Yuba Heat Transfer LLC; Filed By: Cecere, F.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: O'Rourke, P. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance as to Graybar Electric Company, Inc.; Filed By: O'Rourke, P. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Port Authority of New York and New Jersey; Filed By: Mckeown, M.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Viking Pump, Inc.; Filed By: Hsu, M.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) David Fabricators Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Angiolillo, J.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Signed Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Flowserve US; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Elliott Company; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) As against defendant Copes-Vulcan, Inc.; Filed By: Hodges, G.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Fully Executed Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Defendant Gardner Denver; Filed By: Dean, A.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
482 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mccann, T.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less