This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:44:50 (UTC).

ROBERT DELGIORNO et al - v. - JUSTIN R. CIVITANO et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 ROBERT DELGIORNO filed an Other lawsuit against JUSTIN R CIVITANO. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anna Rodriguez-pinto

Robert Delgiorno

Defendants

Christine M Civitano

Justin R. Civitano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LISS, STAFFORD MITCHELL

Attorney at Hertz, Cherson & Rosenthal, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

SCAHILL, FRANCIS J

Attorney at PICCIANO & SCAHILL, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE court appearance

NOTICE court appearance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

NOTICE Court appearance notice

NOTICE Court appearance notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 10/16/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 10/16/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation in Reply

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE court appearance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Court appearance notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 10/16/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 10/16/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2018; Received: 07/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 05/11/2018; Received: 05/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation - Adjournment of Motion; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Scahill, F.; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Liss, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less