This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 19:18:38 (UTC).

Rite Aid Corporation v. City of Corning Board of Assessment Review et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Rite Aid Corporation filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against City of Corning Board of Assessment Review. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel J Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********74CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel J Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rite Aid Corporation

Defendants

City Assessor Corning

CORNING CITY BOARD ASSESSMENT REVIEW

City Corning

Not Yet Classified

Corning-Painted Post Area School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON, ROBERT L

Attorney at Jacobson Law Firm, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

MAGGS, BRYAN JAMES

Attorney at Bryan J. Maggs Law Offices, PLLC

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

WILLIAMS, TED HENRY

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

ROBERTS, NICHOLAS CLYDE

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1); Filed By: Maggs, B.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service County & School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service County & School District; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service City

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service City; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER Tax Certiorari Review

RJI -RE: OTHER Tax Certiorari Review; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1); Filed By: Maggs, B.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service County & School District; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service City; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Tax Certiorari Review; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Jacobson, R.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less