This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 14:23:20 (UTC).

RICKY JONES v. MIGUEL A SIGARAN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 RICKY JONES filed an Other lawsuit against MIGUEL A SIGARAN. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Libert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jack Libert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricky Jones

Defendant

Miguel A Sigaran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANZINI, NICHOLAS

Attorney at NICHOLAS PANZINI, PC

Defendant Attorney

TSE, ANDREA LISETTE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SETTE AND APOZNANSKI

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #001) Certification

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #001) Certification; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - "C" (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order

EXHIBIT(S) - "C" (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - "B" (Motion #001) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - "B" (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - "A" (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - "A" (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Received: 08/02/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tse, A. - filed by Sett & Apoznanski; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Tse, A. - filed by Sett & Apoznanski; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Panzini, N. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panzini, N. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Panzini, N. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #001) Certification; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - "C" (Motion #001) Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - "B" (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - "A" (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Panzini, N.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tse, A. - filed by Sett & Apoznanski; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Tse, A. - filed by Sett & Apoznanski; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Panzini, N. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panzini, N. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Panzini, N. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less