Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 03:01:18 (UTC).

RICHARD RUSSELL - v. - CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 RICHARD RUSSELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Wavny Toussaint. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Wavny Toussaint

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Russell

Defendants and Petitioners

CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.

ASTORIA ENERGY II LLC.

ASTORIA GENERATING COMPANY, L.P.

Respondent

VERDE ELECTRIC CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SKILLMAN, JOSHUA W

Attorney at The Law office of Joshua W. Skillman

gastman, gregory

Attorney at Gorayeb & Associates, PC

Petitioner Attorney

BRIAN C PARRIS

Defendant Attorneys

DEBERNARDIS, PHILIP JOSEPH

Attorney at CORREIA, KING , FODERA, McGINNIS & LIFERIEDGE

EFRATI, LAURA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CORREIA, KING, FODERA, MCGINNIS & LIFERIEDGE

PERRI, CARL M

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC

REINER, JEFFREY A

Attorney at CON EDISON

O'KEEFFE, MARINA

Attorney at NYC Law Department

PARRIS, BRIAN C

Attorney at CONSOLIDATED EDISON

CRONMILLER, THOMAS B

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

Respondent Attorney

CARL M PERRI

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Dated 1/15/20

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Dated 1/15/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #3)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #3); Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Reiner, J. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

DEMAND FOR: Demands

DEMAND FOR: Demands; Filed By: Reiner, J. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer And Cross-Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer And Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Reiner, J. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice Of Commencement

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice Of Commencement; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Dated 1/15/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #3); Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) to Cronmiller Affirmation; Filed By: Cronmiller, T.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claim and Discovery Demands; Filed By: Debernardis, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Reiner, J. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demands; Filed By: Reiner, J. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer And Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Reiner, J. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice Of Commencement; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less