This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 00:22:46 (UTC).

Richard Perez v. Cartus Financial Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Richard Perez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cartus Financial Corporation. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Perez

Defendant

Cartus Financial Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAMONSOFF, MICHAEL SCOTT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL S. LAMONSOFF

Kirschner, Beth J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL S. LAMONSOFF PLLC

LANZA, FRANK

Attorney at Michael Lamonsoff

Defendant Attorneys

GILLER, RONALD A

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

GUIDEA, JENNIFER ANN

Attorney at Gordon Rees LLP

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Property Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Property Deed; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lamonsoff, M.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) of Tina Stephens

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) of Tina Stephens; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #002); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lanza, F.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Property Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Property Deed; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kirschner, B.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Kirschner, B.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Complaint; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Tina Stephens

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Tina Stephens; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lanza, F.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Property Deed; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) of Tina Stephens; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Complaint; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #002); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Property Deed; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Tina Stephens; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Guidea, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lamonsoff, M.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Kirschner, B.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Kirschner, B.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less