Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 04:15:51 (UTC).

RICHARD LASKER et al - v. - PACIFIC PARK 550 VANDERBILT LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 RICHARD LASKER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PACIFIC PARK 550 VANDERBILT LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kurtz, Jcp. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kurtz, Jcp

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard Lasker

Patricia Lasker

Defendants and Petitioners

PLAZA CONSTRUCTION, LLC

PACIFIC PARK 550 VANDERBILT LLC

Respondent

S.J. Electric Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SASSOWER, MITCHELL J

Attorney at ARYE, LUSTIG & SASSOWER, P.C.

LUSTIG, DAVID CARL

Attorney at ARYE LUSTIG & SASSOWER P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

BRIAN PATRICK MCLAUGHLIN

Defendant Attorney

MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN PATRICK

Attorney at LONDON FISCHER LLP

Respondent Attorney

TAMAR SOROKER PELTZ LINA CHRISTINE ROSSILLO ((ARC) 68959)

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) *Corrected* Stipulation Adjourning Motion #3 and Cross-Motion#4

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) *Corrected* Stipulation Adjourning Motion #3 and Cross-Motion#4; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #4) Reply to Plaintiff on cross-Motion for summary judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #4) Reply to Plaintiff on cross-Motion for summary judgment; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #3) Stipulation Adjourning Motions 3 and 4

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #3) Stipulation Adjourning Motions 3 and 4; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Foreman's 24 Hour Incident Report

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Foreman's 24 Hour Incident Report; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Accident Report /Personal Injury

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Accident Report /Personal Injury; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Opposition to cross-motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Opposition to cross-motion; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Stipulation Adjourning Motions #3 and #4

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Stipulation Adjourning Motions #3 and #4; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Opposition to SJ Electric's motion for summary judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Opposition to SJ Electric's motion for summary judgment; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation amending caption by removing parties

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation amending caption by removing parties; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION *Corrected* Stipulation amending caption by removing parties

STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION *Corrected* Stipulation amending caption by removing parties; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) *Corrected* Stipulation Adjourning Motion #3 and Cross-Motion#4; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #4) Reply to Plaintiff on cross-Motion for summary judgment; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #3) Stipulation Adjourning Motions 3 and 4; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Foreman's 24 Hour Incident Report; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Accident Report /Personal Injury; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Opposition to cross-motion; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Stipulation Adjourning Motions #3 and #4; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Opposition to SJ Electric's motion for summary judgment; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Tender letters; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to amended Complaint; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Lustig, D.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation amending caption by removing parties; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION *Corrected* Stipulation amending caption by removing parties; Filed By: Mclaughlin, B.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sassower, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less