This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:44:18 (UTC).

Richard J Stage et al - v. - Theresa L. Egan Exec Deputy Commissioner of Department of Motor Vehicles of State of New York

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Richard J Stage filed an Other lawsuit against Theresa L Egan Exec Deputy Commissioner of Department of Motor Vehicles of State of New York. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1236

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard J Stage

Josefina Stage

Defendant

Theresa L. Egan Exec Deputy Commissioner of Department of Motor Vehicles of State of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEDLAKE, ROBERT H.

Attorney at HINMAN HOWARD & KATTELL LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order Directing Removal of Lien

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order Directing Removal of Lien; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECUSAL LETTER SIGNED FILED 6/9/17

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECUSAL LETTER SIGNED FILED 6/9/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

MEMORANDUM

MEMORANDUM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order Directing Removal of Lien; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECUSAL LETTER SIGNED FILED 6/9/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Wedlake, R.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less