Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 23:41:26 (UTC).

Richard Dearth - v. - Republic Services, Allied Waste Buffalo Recyclery

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 Richard Dearth filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Republic Services, Allied Waste Buffalo Recyclery. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Dearth

Defendant

Republic Services, Allied Waste Buffalo Recyclery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINER, RICHARD JAY

Attorney at STEINER & BLOTNIK

Defendant Attorney

MARCUS, DAVID PAUL

Attorney at MARCUS & CINELLI LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Letter

EXHIBIT(S)

Letter

EXHIBIT(S)

Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Letter; Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Letter; Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Marcus, D. - filed by Marcus & Cinelli, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less