This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:44:28 (UTC).

Richard Alexander et al v. EDP Renewables et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Richard Alexander filed a Property - Land lawsuit against EDP Renewables. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1473

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dianne Stone

Jack Dugan

Jannine Dugan

Joelle Woodard

Paul Gogolack

Douglas Zeller

Carlos Troche

Stacey Timmerman

Sally Newell

Betty Wise

Sandra Leary

Jacqueline Terrill

Charles Restivo

Angelo Graziano

Jane Doe persons who are yet unnamed but similarly situated as the named Plaintiffs

Melissa Congdon

Karen L. Davis

Barbara J. Swansfeger

Defendants

EDP Renewables North America LLC

URS Corporation

116 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Westfall, Melody D.

Attorney at Westfall Law PLLC

KACZOR, STEPHANIE JANE

Attorney at Westfall Law PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

ALTIERI, RYAN CHRISTIAN

Attorney at Barclay Damon LLP

MCCOY, DENNIS R.

Attorney at BARCLAY DAMON, LLP

SOLLER, CHRISTIAN JOSEPH

Attorney at HODGSON RUSS LLP

Other Attorneys

DAMIA, MICHAEL A.

MACRI, JAMES DOMINIC

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

CATONE, SAMANTHA

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA

HUNTER, DANIEL TIMOTHY

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Macri, J.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

ANSWER White Construction Answer to Amended Complaint

ANSWER White Construction Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Catone, S.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Soller, C.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Damia, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

ANSWER *Corrected* Ark Wright Summit Wind Farm Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint

ANSWER *Corrected* Ark Wright Summit Wind Farm Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mccoy, D.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

ANSWER *Corrected* EDP Renewables North America Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint

ANSWER *Corrected* EDP Renewables North America Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mccoy, D.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon White Constru ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon White Constru ... show more; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon URS Corporati ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon URS Corporati ... show more; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech ES, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech ES, Inc.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech EC, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech EC, Inc.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech Construction, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech Construction, Inc.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Fisher Associates, P.E., L.S.(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Fisher Associates, P.E., L.S.(..); Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Fisher Associates, P.E., L.S.(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Fisher Associates, P.E., L.S.(..); Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon EDP Renewables North America (..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon EDP Renewables North America (..); Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Arkwright Summit Wind Farm LL(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Arkwright Summit Wind Farm LL(..); Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Macri, J.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER White Construction Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Catone, S.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Soller, C.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Damia, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER *Corrected* Ark Wright Summit Wind Farm Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mccoy, D.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER *Corrected* EDP Renewables North America Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mccoy, D.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon White Construction of Indiana; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon URS Corporation; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech, Inc.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon URS Corporation; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech ES, Inc.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech EC, Inc.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Tetra Tech Construction, Inc.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Fisher Associates, P.E., L.S., L.A., D.P.C.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Fisher Associates, P.E., L.S., L.A. of New York, P.C.; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon EDP Renewables North America LLC; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Electronic Filing upon Arkwright Summit Wind Farm LLC; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Westfall, M.; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less