Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 01:11:48 (UTC).

Richard A. Ball - v. - Saleh M Omar

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 Richard A Ball filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Saleh M Omar. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8-17

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard A. Ball as Commissioner of Agriculture and Markets of the State of New York

Defendant

Saleh M Omar d/b/a Natural Deli & Grocery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNOLD, FREDERICK B.

RODRIGUEZ, JAMES R.

Attorney at NEW YORK STATE INSURANCE FUND

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

JUDGMENT Entered by Clerk

JUDGMENT Entered by Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Affidavit and SCRA Status Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Affidavit and SCRA Status Report; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) ENTERED BY CLERK

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) ENTERED BY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Entered by Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Military Affidavit and SCRA Status Report; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) ENTERED BY CLERK; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Summons with Notice; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less